CARLTON PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (NOTTINGHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pre-school carlton nottingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 September 2023
Total income includes £103,035 from 20 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 April 2006: Standard registration
- 30 November 2021: Funds received from 506384 WESTDALE PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
- FOXY CREEK PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESTHER COLEMAN-SMITH | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maria Antonietta Cranfield | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 28/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.96k | £158.38k | £90.68k | £105.74k | £117.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.04k | £73.36k | £90.91k | £110.73k | £114.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £103.05k | £67.76k | £91.00k | £103.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 September 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 232 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 September 2020 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 September 2020 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 02 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CARLTON, NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Richard Herrod Centre
Foxhill Road
Carlton
NOTTINGHAM
NG4 1RL
- Phone:
- 0115 9400958
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window