SAFFRON WALDEN COMMUNITY CINEMA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saffron Screen is an independent community cinema screening a wide range of films and seeking through film to entertain, educate, create a shared experience and improve the quality of life for everyone in Saffron Walden and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 14 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Paul Willmot | Chair | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Margaret Downham | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Parkin | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Roberts | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Reed | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Alexander Early | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £406.07k | £288.36k | £299.84k | £281.86k | £338.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £420.93k | £284.73k | £303.55k | £357.00k | £336.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £123.04k | £115.31k | £32.58k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY THE ART OF FILMS AND ALLIED VISUAL TECHNIQUES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT SAFFRON WALDEN COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SAFFRON WALDEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 High Street
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB10 1AY
- Phone:
- 01799500238
- Email:
- info@saffronscreen.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window