HARM REDUCTION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1117375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH AND SAFETY BY: (A) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF DRUG USE AND ASSOCIATED PROBLEMS, (PARTICULARLY RELATING TO ILLICIT DRUGS AND ALCOHOL); (B) DEVELOPING POLICIES AND STRATEGIES TO REDUCE LEVELS OF HARM ASSOCIATED WITH DRUG USE; (C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ORGANISATIONS IN POLICIES AND STRATEGIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • IHRA (Working name)
  • INTERNATIONAL HARM REDUCTION ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mina Barling Chair 27 November 2024
None on record
Fany Pineda Miranda Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
William Pick Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
John Porter Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
Oluseyi Remi Kehinde Trustee 02 April 2021
None on record
Raminta Stuikyte Trustee 02 April 2021
None on record
Dr ALEXANDER WILLIAM STEVENS Trustee 13 May 2020
None on record
Alexandra Lucy Mary Burns Trustee 02 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.47m £898.05k £823.41k £1.35m £2.01m
Total expenditure £1.43m £814.98k £849.50k £1.06m £1.94m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £90 £48.01k £101.37k £10.39k £29.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.47m £849.95k £722.02k £1.34m £1.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £153 £0 £0 £970 £7.23k
Income - Other £0 £94 £23 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £814.98k £849.50k £1.06m £1.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £29.01k £0 £0 £0 £61
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £34.33k £28.42k £18.93k £9.44k £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £430.43k £594.82k £912.94k £908.90k £1.03m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £359.19k £434.60k £769.32k £459.94k £498.69k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
61 Mansell Street
Aldgate
London
E1 8AN
Phone:
07581190642
Email:
ed@hri.global