DENBIGHSHIRE HOME-START
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Denbighshire Home Start is a voluntary organisation in which volunteers offer regular support, friendship and practical help to young families under stress, in their own homes, helping to prevent family crisis and breakdown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 26 April 2007: Standard registration
- 11 February 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1105577 HOME-START CYMRU FOR FAMILIES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.07k | £171.49k | £76.50k | £102.99k | £101.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.49k | £137.13k | £124.36k | £102.56k | £103.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £49.78k | £54.36k | £17.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £600 | £5.21k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 23 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3.1.1 SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 3.1.2 PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 3.1.3 RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. 3.1.4 PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF COUNTY BOROUGH OF DENBIGHSHIRE.
Area of benefit
DENBIGHSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window