Accounts and annual returns THE MAIA PROJECT

Charity Number: 1112777
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required