THE MAIA PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Maia Project has been setup for the promotion of the arts within the local area. This involves bringing like minded people together, signposting people looking for information and assisting with the promotion and running of arts events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 20 January 2006: Standard registration
- 27 April 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.20k | £11.31k | £20 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £983 | £22.90k | £33 | £1.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.20k | £750 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS BY THE PROVISION OF: A) VOCATIONAL COURSES FOR ARTISTS AND PERFORMERS; B) COURSES, LECTURES, WORKSHOPS, PERFORMANCES AND EXHIBITIONS; AND C) FACILITIES FOR THE PARTICIPATION IN AND THE PREPARATION, CREATION, PRESENTATION AND PERFORMANCE OF THE ARTS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window