MERLIN LOCOMOTIVE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an educational activity and service at Aln valley railway, Northumberland
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Spiller | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Spencer | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Heaton Mrs | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Lamb | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HENRY CAINE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £2.09k | £160 | £7.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £267 | £138 | £2.25k | £1.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 July 2024 | 524 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
1) TO MAINTAIN, PRESERVE AND PROTECT STEAM RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES; IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PECKETT LOCOMOTIVE NO. 1967 "MERLIN" AND GUARD'S VAN, AND THE RAILWAY LINE SITUATED BETWEEN THE TWO MUSEUM SITES AT SHILDON, IN COUNTY DURHAM. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF RAILWAY STEAM LOCOMOTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI BUT IN PRACTICE COUNTY DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOCOMOTION
SHILDON
COUNTY DURHAM
DL4 1PQ
- Phone:
- 01388777999
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window