UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN EAST SUFFOLK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Activities for older people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamel Alkateb | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ms Lee Lister | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Peatman | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Steward | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Cornish | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peatman | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Edwards | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Edwin Williams | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Simpson | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jonathan Whiting | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter Biggs | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.29k | £31.36k | £33.23k | £34.43k | £36.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.02k | £20.13k | £44.69k | £27.16k | £44.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APR 2005 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 The Whinneys
Kesgrave
IPSWICH
IP5 2XR
- Phone:
- 01473626183
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window