THE FRIENDS OF ST ALPHEGE SCHOOLS SOLIHULL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and assisting in the provision of facilities for the education of children of St Alphege Schools in accordance with the constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Solihull
Governance
- 19 May 2006: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST ALPHEGE SCHOOLS (Working name)
- FSAS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Ballard | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Miller | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annalise Marie Bartlett | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.64k | £34.43k | £15.11k | £19.34k | £24.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.88k | £39.86k | £20.14k | £11.85k | £14.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST. ALPHEGE SCHOOLS, SOLIHULL, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; A) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING IT; AND B) THE MAINTENANCE, ALTERATION OR EXTENSION OF THE SCHOOL BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
SOLIHULL, WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of St Alphege Schools
St Alphege Infant School
New ROAD
Solihull
West MIdlands
B91 3DW
- Phone:
- 07971 684058
- Email:
- FSASENQUIRIES@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window