WOMEN IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of women worldwide who are socially and/or economically disadvantaged. We currently work in India with women who have HIV/Aids TB, mental illness or who are abused abandoned, raped and are sick or injured. We provide medical and social care. We encourage and facilitate rehabilitation back to community & family, & independent earning/employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 14 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL MADALINE GRAHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
RACHEL THAKKAR-HERBERT | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
SANDRA JUNE PATTISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JUDITH BAINBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.69k | £68.23k | £71.18k | £62.00k | £65.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.68k | £83.61k | £74.33k | £89.63k | £66.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN PARTICULAR BY; (A) PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THEIR HEALTH (B) RELIEVING THEIR POVERTY (C) RELIEVING THEIR SICKNESS; AND (D) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FROSTERLEY COTTAGE
INTAKE LANE
FROSTERLEY
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 2TH
- Phone:
- 01388528497
- Email:
- sandra@women-in-need.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window