SPRINGHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community of Spring Hill ward particular and Hyndburn more generally. Manage a community centre. Promote and organise co-operation between local inhabitants, voluntary & community orgaisations, statutory bodies and other agencies by promoting training, health issues, relief of poverty, public safety & community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHIFA BEGUM | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £9.67k | £0 | £7.56k | £6.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.86k | £8.97k | £0 | £10.88k | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF SPRINGHILL WARD PARTICULARLY AND HYNDBURN MORE GENERALLY, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RACIAL HARMONY AND COMMUNITY COHESION, THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE FACILITIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, UNEMPLOYMENT OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; (2) TO PROVIDE AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN LOCAL INHABITANTS, VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS, STATUTORY BODIES AND OTHER AGENCIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
SPRINGHILL WARD PARTICULARLY AND HYNDBURN MORE GENERALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPRING HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE
EXCHANGE STREET
ACCRINGTON
BB5 0JD
- Phone:
- 01254392974
- Email:
- info@springhillcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window