Financial history BARKING AND DAGENHAM YOUTH DANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 1113618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £72.84k £86.42k £114.43k £133.49k £207.75k
Total expenditure £48.73k £56.93k £78.90k £98.07k £142.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.96k £22.16k £36.31k £9.00k £16.25k