FULHAM GOOD NEIGHBOUR SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing volunteer support services to people in need, mainly older, in the Fulham Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £47,250 from 1 government contract(s) and £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
251 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 11 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert John Edward Fryer | Chair |
|
||||||||
Avril Peyton | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Annabel Daisy Meakin | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Payne | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Outred | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Nicola Sansom | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Lorna Payne | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Sue O'Neill | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Jennifer Hadley Whittle | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.22k | £242.87k | £255.15k | £268.82k | £386.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.79k | £206.71k | £234.53k | £267.54k | £376.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £47.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.00k | £47.00k | £54.61k | £50.99k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY 3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: (A) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO THE PEOPLE OF FULHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THEIR OWN HOMES OR ELSEWHERE AS MAY BE REQUIRED ARISING FROM AGE, ILLNESS, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY OR OTHER NEED. (B) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE OF THE NATURE REFERRED TO IN 3.1(A) OR OTHERWISE TO COMPLEMENT SERVICES PROVIDED BY HEALTH AND SOCIAL SERVICES. REFERENCE TO FULHAM MEANS THE AREA OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF FULHAM AS CONSTITUTED ON 31 MARCH 1965.
Area of benefit
FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF FULHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fulham Good Neighbours
Rosaline Hall
70 Rosaline Road
London
SW6 7QT
- Phone:
- 02073858850
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window