WARRINGTON DISABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1113597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Warrington Disability Partnership (WDP) is an internationally acclaimed user led charity. With almost 30 years experience of developing and delivering mobility and independent living services, our aim is to support disabled people and people living with long term health conditions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City
  • Warrington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 2006: Standard registration
  • 14 April 2022: Funds received from 1145515 PLAYABILITY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WDP (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Gartside Chair 17 March 2015
None on record
Patricia Ann McLaren Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Anthony Brown Trustee 23 January 2022
None on record
Adam Haines Trustee 23 January 2022
None on record
Susan Mary McMillan Trustee 21 January 2020
THE FRIENDS OF HILBRE
Received: On time
Anita Cawley Trustee 22 January 2019
HALTON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
David Andrew Kelsall Trustee 05 December 2017
None on record
EILEEN CAMPBELL MACDONALD Trustee
None on record
JANICE MARY PRICHARD Trustee
None on record
MRS PAT KITTO Trustee
None on record
GARY SKENTELBERY Trustee
THE ADRIAN DERBYSHIRE FOUNDATION
Received: 1 day late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.90m £995.31k £1.26m £1.13m £2.45m
Total expenditure £1.78m £977.43k £1.17m £1.17m £2.36m
Income from government contracts £97.61k £63.59k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £394.47k £357.52k £627.66k £470.82k £753.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £18.95k £27.08k £8.23k £17.64k £12.75k
Income - Other trading activities £1.29m £250.03k £372.68k £492.61k £1.60m
Income - Charitable activities £582.93k £430.28k £726.18k £610.06k £836.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £777 £6 £60.06k £43 £496
Income - Other £1.85k £287.92k £92.33k £10.80k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £969.76k £1.15m £1.12m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £750.72k £7.68k £24.37k £58.02k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £6.59k £25.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £985.75k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £147.73k £83.09k £84.59k £1 £186.14k
Long-term investments £0 £1 £1 £78.09k £0
Other assets £637.48k £589.45k £705.15k £624.55k £795.55k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £178.32k £81.24k £111.49k £66.82k £247.67k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Warrington Disability Partnership
Unit 1
Beaufort Street
WARRINGTON
WA5 1BA
Phone:
01925240064