KP KHOO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR KAY PENG KHOO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £9.85k | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £55 | £40 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
TO SPREAD THE GOSPEL AND THE WORD OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIS PRINCIPALLY THROUGH: (A) EVANGELISTIC RALLIES AND/OR MEETINGS, PRINT AND/OR ANY FORM OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA; (B) PREACHING, TEACHING AND TRAINING WHEREVER IN THE WORLD; (C) SUPPORT AND/OR CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE ASSIMILATION BUILDING OR PLANTING OF A CHURCH RO CHURCHES IN AN AREA (AS DEFINED IN HE ARTICLES) WHERE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES: (I) THERE ARE NO FULL GOSPEL EVANGELISTIC CHURCHES; AND/OR (II) THERE ARE RESIDENT NOT LESS THAN 100,000 PEOPLE; (D) THE PROCLAMATION TO ALL ETHNIC GROUPS REGARDLESS OF RELIGION OR GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATION; PROVIDED THAT NO FUNDS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE USED FOR THE PURPOSE OF ACQUIRING, CONSTRUCTING, IMPROVING OR MAINTAINING LAND OR BUILDINGS EXCEPT DURING DR KHOO'S LIFETIME AND THEN ONLY WITH HIS EXPRESS WRITTEN CONSENT, BUT FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THE CHARITY MAY AT ANY TIME ACQUIRE, CONSTRUCT, MAINTAIN OR IMPROVE LAND OR BUILDINGS FOR ITS INTERNAL ADMINISTRATIVE OR INVESTMENT PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAURA ASHLEY LTD
DESIGN CENTRE
27 BAGLEYS LANE
LONDON
SW6 2QA
- Phone:
- 02078805204
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window