THE SEA OF FAITH NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to advance the education of the public in religious studies with particular reference to religious faith seen as a human creation - through day and residential conferences, publications, local membership groups and other membership activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Williams | Chair | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Mitchell | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Muriel Seargeant | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Edward James Nickell | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Essame | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.71k | £19.36k | £12.76k | £11.25k | £13.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.79k | £10.09k | £17.35k | £15.09k | £18.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 27 JULY 2005 AMENDED 20 JULY 2006. as amended on 26 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELIGIOUS STUDIES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO RELIGIOUS FAITH SEEN AS A HUMAN CREATION
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sea of Faith Network via Edward Nickell
Flat 51 Park Central
60 Fairfield Road
Bow Quarter
Tower Hamlets
E3 2US
- Phone:
- 07916698982
- Email:
- secretary@sofn.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.