COLLINS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims to help young people and children in their education and training by making grants to individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Butcher | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
JACK MATTHEW COLLARD | Trustee | 07 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
FRANK GEOFFREY COLLINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.89k | £49.08k | £40.89k | £49.76k | £128.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.83k | £62.50k | £73.13k | £74.10k | £77.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT 3.1.1 IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSAR1ES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ORDER TO ATTEND SUCH EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND 3.1.2 IN OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
COUNTIES OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, SOMERSET, SURREY, WILTSHIRE AND THE AREA OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES BEING THE FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 COLLETT WAY
FROME
BA11 2XR
- Phone:
- 01373466408
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window