Trustees FURNESS MUSIC CENTRE
Charity number: 1112934

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIona Roberts | Chair | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Louise Hampshire | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madelaine Heslop | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Wray | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simone Bernadette Huitson | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Heffernan | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Wood | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Ashworth | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN GILLAM | Trustee | 22 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN BAXTER | Trustee | 22 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 04 November 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.