THE TAVISTOCK SUBSCRIPTION LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public by preserving and collecting historical information relating to Tavistock and the surrounding area and providing library facilities for reference and research. We currently hold Coffee mornings Writers Groups besides offering research and study opportunities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 12 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Patrick Dell MBE QCB | Chair | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Roger Charles Croxson | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Helen Lace | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wyn Cudlip | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Fairclough Maslen | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pancheri | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Mary Gardiner | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ruth Blowey | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Luckman | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.77k | £4.93k | £5.94k | £9.37k | £9.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £4.93k | £5.59k | £4.44k | £7.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2007. as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY PRESERVING AND COLLECTING HISTORICAL INFORMATION RELATING TO TAVISTOCK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND PROVIDING LIBRARY FACILITIES FOR REFERENCE AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
TAVISTOCK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tavistock Subscription Library
Court Gate
Guildhall Square
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 0AE
- Phone:
- 07845 176870
- Email:
- tavistock.subslib@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window