UK CLINICAL ETHICS NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK Clinical Ethics Network (UKCEN) is the over-arching coordinating body for Clinical Ethics Committees (CECs) in the UK. CECs are advisory bodies attached to NHS trusts, who aim to advise clinicians on ethical issues regarding patient care and their trusts about the ethical implications of new policies. UKCEN organises annual conferences, sets standards and runs a website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD HUXTABLE | Chair | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Marianne Tinkler | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michal Pruski | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Quinn Bratton | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Carey Baff | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Harleen Kaur Johal | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rami El-Shirbiny | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Raj Kumar Mohindra | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Kiran Jani | Trustee | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN BRIDSON | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.06k | £3.47k | £5.25k | £8.90k | £13.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.57k | £1.88k | £1.49k | £15.70k | £14.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED 22 MAY 2007 as amended on 17 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF HEALTH CARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN THE PROVISION OF HEALTH CARE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THOSE INVOLVED IN ETHICAL DECISION MAKING IN CLINICAL SITUATIONS 2. ASSISTING POLICY MAKERS IN HEALTH CARE SETTINGS WITH REGARD TO ETHICAL CONSIDERATIONS PERTAINING TO CLINICAL POLICY DEVELOPMENT 3. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE FIELD OF CLINICAL ETHICS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 3749
PO BOX 6945
LONDON
W1A 6US
- Phone:
- 02088364003
- Email:
- info@ukcen.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window