Financial history WEST BYFLEET SCORPIONS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1113513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.11k £19.04k £15.11k £34.18k £38.57k
Total expenditure £10.81k £12.76k £16.56k £35.41k £41.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A