IMAGINER CONSULTING LIMITED

Charity number: 1115376
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The company has not traded during the year. Imaginer offers a range of consulting services free of charge to nonprofit organisations internationally to improve accountability, governance, and organisational efficacy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016

Total income: £11
Total expenditure: £2,232

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 2006: Standard registration
  • 20 June 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ASPIRE PARTNERS FOR SOCIAL ENTERPRISE LIMITED (Previous name)
  • IMAGINER ADVISORS FOR THE SOCIAL ENTERPRISE LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £8.61k £0 £1.07k £1 £11
Total expenditure £9.50k £0 £1.83k £1.03k £2.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required