THE FRIENDS OF PUTTENHAM CHURCH

Charity number: 1114720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To seek to ensure the preservation of the building and curtilage of the Parish Church of St.John the Baptist,Puttenham,Surrey for the benefit of the public as a building of historic and architectural importance by raising funds for the execution of capital projects designed to improve its amenity and to advance the education of the public as to the importance of maintaining the building's heritage

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,509
Total expenditure: £604

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Elise Duris Trustee 23 September 2022
None on record
Alyson Barbara Warner Trustee 23 September 2022
None on record
Melanie Jayne Mardle Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Crosby Trustee 09 October 2020
None on record
Ella Crickitt Trustee 20 July 2018
None on record
Rebecca Frances Henry Trustee 29 September 2014
None on record
JOHN REID HEWITSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.98k £3.86k £53.54k £5.91k £6.51k
Total expenditure £1.81k £10.62k £657 £1.52k £604
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
QUESTORS
MONKS GROVE
COMPTON
GUILDFORD
GU3 1EA
Phone:
01483810431
Website:

No information available