Financial history THE SUDANESE NUBIAN ASSOCIATION - UK

Charity number: 1115984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/11/2020 25/11/2021 25/11/2022 25/11/2023 25/11/2024
Total gross income £22.60k £23.84k £34.25k £10.84k £39.49k
Total expenditure £18.93k £6.50k £41.83k £8.06k £22.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.60k £7.55k N/A N/A N/A