LISS YOUTH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION AND RUNNING OF A YOUTH CENTRE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 10 TO 18 IN THE LISS AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 April 2006: Standard registration
- CROSSOVER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Miloslav Love | Chair | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Read | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Evans | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Phillip De la Perrelle | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Ellis Buckingham | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.62k | £94.40k | £85.10k | £186.93k | £70.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.17k | £90.34k | £96.80k | £91.59k | £96.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.09k | £10.16k | £10.67k | £5.89k | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 24 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 20 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN LISS IN HAMPSHIRE AND THE IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING PARISHES IN HAMPSHIRE AND SUSSEX, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF LISS IN HAMPSHIRE AND IMMEDIATELY ADJOINING PARISHES IN HAMPSHIRE AND SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Marys Church Hall
Station Road
Liss
- Phone:
- 01730892981
- Email:
- admin@crossoverliss.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window