OUGHTRINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity oversees the ongoing maintenance and improvement of Oughtrington Community Centre and a programme of activities for delivery in the Community Centre. It also works with other charities and organisations for the benefit of local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 13 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Allanson | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain Penlington | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hugh Storer | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Openshaw | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Natasha Welsh | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Marie Lombardi-Brown | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Elizabeth Kerley | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.50k | £51.71k | £19.08k | £24.54k | £26.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.76k | £21.90k | £24.20k | £29.17k | £48.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.57k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2021
(These accounts |
17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OUGHTRINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF, SUCH A COMMUNITY CENTRE IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS 3. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND OR OPEN SPACE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (B) THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 4. TO PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
OUGHTRINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oughtrington Community Centre
1 Oughtrington Crescent
LYMM
Cheshire
WA13 9JD
- Phone:
- 01925754178
- Email:
- contact@oughtrington.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window