Financial history AGE CONCERN HASSOCKS & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1114153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £166.92k £110.74k £145.51k £174.87k £196.17k
Total expenditure £212.85k £150.98k £199.85k £238.29k £284.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £71.82k £16.28k £1.00k £500