Accounts and annual returns REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD RCCG PENTECOST HOUSE

Charity number: 1112946
Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 December 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 December 2022 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 December 2022 776 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required