REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD RCCG PENTECOST HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching Preaching the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ Mentoring the youth in the community Ministry to family carers in the community Prviding free tuition to the youth in the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Nigeria
Governance
- 07 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FEMI AKINOLA | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID OFORI | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR PHILLIP SEGUN OYETUNJI | Trustee |
|
||||||
DEACON OBAFEMI AFOLABIADETAYO AWOTUNBO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.65k | £7.21k | £5.50k | £4.82k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.61k | £6.56k | £5.72k | £3.27k | £2.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 December 2022 | 776 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
360 SHROFFOLD ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 5JE
- Phone:
- 02086987911
- Email:
- adeyemo70@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window