Financial history ATKIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112925
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.86k £1.41k £291 £8.90k £35.60k
Total expenditure £833.60k £755.71k £860.47k £666.10k £699.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A