Accounts and annual returns SCHOOL2SCHOOL

Charity number: 1113306
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 21 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 22 January 2009 352 days late