KASHMIR RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing help to the affecties of Earthquake & Flood in Pakistan/Kashmir
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Pakistan
Governance
- 12 June 2006: Standard registration
- 22 March 2018: Funds received from 1145673 WORLDWIDE UMMAH AID
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED LATIF KHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Imran Javaid | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niaz Ahmed | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAHMOOD HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.58k | £68.07k | £78.35k | £46.81k | £52.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.52k | £53.61k | £61.53k | £64.57k | £58.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN JAMMU KASHMIR AND THE PEOPLE OF KASHMIRI ORIGIN LIVING IN THE UK BY: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND HELP TO THE PEOPLE OF JAMMU KASHMIR AFFECTED BY NATURAL OR OTHER DISASTERS WITH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, SHELTER, MEDICINE, EDUCATION AND SETTING UP OF SMALL INDUSTRIES TO IMPROVE THEIR LIVING AND ENVIRONMENTAL CONDITION.
Area of benefit
JAMMU KASHMIR AND THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
140 HOE STREET
WALTHAMSTOW
LONDON
E17 4QR
- Phone:
- 02085090880
- Email:
- info@krdf.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window