INDEPENDENT DIPLOMAT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote conflict resolution, reconciliation and relief of poverty to benefit the public by increasing skills/capacities in diplomacy of those who are in need of those skills and who have the capability to promote conflict resolution and reconciliation within government and in international institutions, including the UN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARNE ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GARDNER THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.02k | £69.75k | £7.23k | £6.52k | £89.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £351.60k | £65.74k | £51.13k | £54.81k | £67.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £258.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING SKILLS AND CAPACITIES IN DIPLOMACY OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH EXPERTISE AND WHO ALSO HAVE THE CAPABILITY TO PROMOTE CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION WITHIN GOVERNMENT AND IN INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, INCLUDING THOSE OF THE UNITED NATIONS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURE, USES AND CONDUCT OF DIPLOMACY WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION)" TO ITS USES IN CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION. PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE ACTIVITIES SHALL BE NEUTRAL AND BALANCED AND SHALL MAINTAIN OR ENHANCE THE COMPANY'S COMMITMENT TO: = OBSERVANCE OF INTERNATIONAL LAW; RESPECT FOR INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTIONS INCLUDING THOSE OF THE UNITED NATIONS AND THE INSTITUTIONS OF GOVERNMENT GENERALLY. = THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS. ½ SUPPORT OF DEMOCRATIC AND ACCOUNTABLE GOVERNANCE. O REFUSAL OF SUPPORT TO THOSE PROMOTING UNLAWFUL VIOLENCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
166 College Road
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 1RA
- Phone:
- 0012125948295
- Email:
- INFO@INDEPENDENTDIPLOMAT.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window