Trustees RED BALLOON - NORWICH
Charity number: 1117092

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Terence Clogan | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zelda Charmaine Rolfe | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Douglas Boland | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Marshall | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Dabin | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Frank Ridge-Ward | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Culley | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Blyth | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin William Aldridge | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.