SUPPORT FOR INTERNATIONAL CHANGE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE AWARENESS AND INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE GLOBAL HIV EPIDEMIC AMONGST UK SCHOOLCHILDREN AND UNIVERSITY STUDENTS. TO INSPIRE AND FACILITATE ACTION AND FUND RAISING TO HELP PROVIDE PRACTICAL SUPPORT, TESTING AND HEALTH CARE TREATMENT FOR THOSE WITH HIV/AIDS IN TANZANIA. TO MINIMISE THE SPREAD AND IMPACT OF HIV/AIDS IN TANZANIA THROUGH EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Leicester City
- Liverpool City
- Sheffield City
- Staffordshire
- Throughout London
- Tanzania
Governance
- 10 April 2006: Standard registration
- 21 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- SIC UK (Working name)
- STUDENTS FOR INTERNATIONAL CHANGE UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.78k | £33.87k | £18.37k | £14.07k | £8.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.98k | £33.18k | £18.59k | £10.06k | £6.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 May 2016 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 31 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 5 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
(1) TO RAISE AWARENESS OF HIV/AIDS IN TANZANIA AND THE SOLOMON ISLANDS AMONGST THE BRITISH PEOPLE AND THE IMPACT IT HAS. SIC UK AIMS TO FACILITATE ACTION AND FUND RAISING THROUGH EVENTS THAT ARE BOTH INFORMATIVE AND MOTIVATIONAL (2) TO PROVIDE PRACTICAL SUPPORT, TESTING AND HEALTH CARE TREATMENT TO INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES IN TANZANIA AND THE SOLOMON ISLANDS AFFECTED BY THE HIV/AIDS VIRUS, THUS EASING SUFFERING/PREVENTING SPREAD. (3) TO CONTINUE THE PROGRAMME OF EDUCATION AIMED AT MINIMISING THE SPREAD AND IMPACT OF HIV/AIDS IN TANZANIA. USING THIS MODEL, SIC UK AIMS TO ESTABLISH AN EDUCATIONAL FRAMEWORK TO MEET THE SAME EDUCATION NEEDS IN THE SOLOMON ISLANDS.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA AND THE SOLOMON ISLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window