Financial history LIMITLESS MERCY MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1114031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £112.64k £90.59k £108.17k £168.98k £126.31k
Total expenditure £77.93k £64.71k £90.73k £101.13k £134.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A