PRESTATYN ENVIRONMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to protect and conserve the countryside, seas and local shoreline; to help protect the flora and fauna and threatened habitats within the local area; to increase opportunity and access to sites of environmental and conservation interest; to highlight and promote environmental strategies/projects, which will help reduce social isolation to raise awareness of environment and conservation issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 03 August 2006: Standard registration
- Environmentally Prestatyn (Working name)
- PRESTATYN AND DISTRICT ENVIRONMENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Prestatyn Environment Association (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Roberts | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Pierce | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Owena Jones | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Sandilands | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
HELEN ELIZABETH WARD - HUGHES | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM RAYMOND WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN THOMAS BARTON SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES MICHAEL DAVIES MP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYN ALWYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £773 | £260 | £247 | £559 | £194 | |
|
Total expenditure | £247 | £69 | £353 | £680 | £254 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 17 JULY 2006 as amended on 05 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN PRESTATYN AND DISTRICT AREAS OF NORTH WALES FOR THE PURPOSE OF STUDY AND RESEARCH IN ALL AREAS OF NATURAL AND SCIENTIFIC INTEREST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PRESTATYN AND DISTRICT AREAS OF NORTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 ABERCONWAY ROAD
PRESTATYN
LL19 9HH
- Phone:
- 01745853050
- Email:
- wardhughes@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window