Financial history HAMPSHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE DOGS

Charity number: 1114740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.99k £22.69k £31.58k £23.38k £39.80k
Total expenditure £56.49k £22.16k £23.97k £22.98k £32.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k £10.50k £7.69k N/A £21.36k