HEARING HELP ESSEX LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hearing Help Essex is a registered charity governed by a memorandum and articles of association. The charity's object is the relief of people with an acquired hearing loss and who are hard of hearing resident in mid-Essex and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £126,113 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 30 March 2006: Standard registration
- 15 January 2015: Funds received from 289280 HEARING HELP - UTTLESFORD
- 23 February 2023: Funds received from 1078781 THE ROTARY CLUB OF BRENTWOOD BREAKFAST TRUST FUND
- 10 May 2024: Funds received from 1051761 MALDON AND DISTRICT VISION IMPAIRED CLUB
- 25 September 2024: Funds received from 1190195 ESSEX HEARING ADVICE SERVICES LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pam Lorimer | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Last | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Martin | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deesha Bedia | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roberts | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.73k | £101.98k | £132.43k | £150.71k | £224.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.82k | £99.96k | £121.23k | £183.48k | £238.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £16.04k | N/A | N/A | £126.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | £89.88k | £9.50k | £33.79k | £37.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH AN ACQUIRED HEARING LOSS AND WHO ARE HARD OF HEARING RESIDENT IN MID-ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
MID-ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meadow View Cottage
Moulsham Mill
Parkway
CHELMSFORD
Essex
- Phone:
- 01245496347
- Email:
- info@hearinghelpessex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window