Financial history BRIGHT MORNING STAR

Charity number: 1116708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.81k £2.73k £8.12k £2.31k £2.86k
Total expenditure £3.65k £3.43k £4.46k £3.33k £3.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A