Financial history CLIFTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1113295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.09k £12.03k £8.79k £9.44k £9.95k
Total expenditure £14.40k £13.16k £6.57k £13.12k £7.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A