CLARKS FARM GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides safe kennels for ex-racing greyhounds, promotes them as pets and pro-actively seeks to find homes for them
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Dorset
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
edward patmore | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Ward | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emilyjade farr | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PHILIP COBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.96k | £962.88k | £249.23k | £269.28k | £331.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.43k | £149.80k | £261.80k | £234.29k | £258.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.65k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.15k | £3.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £936.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £24.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £800.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £148.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £1.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 289 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF GREYHOUNDS AND PROTECT SUCH DOGS FROM CRUELTY PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING TEMPORARY SHELTER AND PLACING GREYHOUNDS IN SUITABLE PERMANENT HOMES. FOR THOSE GREYHOUNDS THAT HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES OWING TO AGE, ABANDONMENT, INJURY OR OTHER SUFFICIENT REASON WHICH HAS TERMINATED THEIR SPORTING LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICEESSEX, SUFFOLK, KENT, HERTFORDSHIRE AND CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clarks Farm Greyhounds
Wash Lane
Little Totham
Maldon
CM9 8LX
- Phone:
- 01621788315
- Email:
- clarksfarm@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window