THE BURKE FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1113083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support such institutions and purposes as are charitable according to the law of England & Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER BURKE Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
ELAINE SARGENT Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
LINDA TEARE Trustee 09 March 2017
None on record
FRANK JOSEPH BURKE Trustee
None on record
BRIDGET PHILOMENA BURKE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £68 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 December 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Phoenix House
Oxford Road
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 7AP
Phone:
01753313512
Website:

No information available