THE FRIENDS OF REDHILL FIELD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1113933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

AS A SCHOOL PTA WE RAISE FUNDS BY HAVING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES WITHIN SCHOOL, SUCH AS BINGO, QUIZZES, AND A SUMMER AND CHRISMAS FAIR. ALL THE MONEY RAISED IS USED TO BENEFIT THE CHILDREN, AND ADULTS, INVOLVED WITH OUR PRIMARY SCHOOL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £4,758
Total expenditure: £140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Joy Carver Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
Suzanne Britton Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £12.01k £10.63k £9.61k £5.39k £4.76k
Total expenditure £15.33k £12.38k £14.76k £321 £140
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £500 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 18 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 June 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 November 2020 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Red Hill Field Primary School
Copt Oak Road
Narborough
LEICESTER
LE19 3EF
Phone:
01162841500