Financial history THE DHANA TRUST

Charity number: 1113122
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £3.69k £100 £1.01k £322 £234
Total expenditure £3.36k £0 £1.58k £0 £540
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A