Financial history THE FEBRUARY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1113064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £17.21m £17.59m £12.76m £7.18m £8.48m
Total expenditure £12.82m £11.91m £27.41m £4.36m £4.43m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.16m £13.54m £8.67m £2.97m £2.89m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £13.16m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.05m £4.04m £4.10m £4.21m £5.59m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.74m £11.81m £27.28m £4.24m £4.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £84.36k £103.82k £128.91k £118.69k £126.49k
Expenditure - Governance £130.69k £18.01k £18.94k £132.44k £143.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.61m £11.68m £27.12m £4.11m £4.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £84.36k £103.82k £128.91k £118.69k £126.49k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0