HOME-START CARMARTHEN-LLANELLI
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Carmarthen-Llanelli offers support, friendship and practical help to parents with young children in the Carmarthen and Llanelli area. We offer a unique service, recruiting and training volunteers - who are usually parents themselves - to visit families at home who have at least one child under 5 to offer informal, friendly and confidential support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £122,921 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 05 April 2006: Standard registration
- 26 April 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1105577 HOME-START CYMRU FOR FAMILIES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.89k | £184.93k | £142.39k | £131.68k | £126.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.69k | £194.87k | £153.74k | £131.79k | £115.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £134.25k | £135.27k | £122.92k | £122.92k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 22 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 14 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 14 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 14 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 14 November 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH., BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF CARMARTHEN, LLANELLI AND THEIR ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF CARMATHEN, L LLANELLI.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window