Financial history STREET TALK

Charity number: 1117588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.81k £200.01k £133.09k £172.75k £162.65k
Total expenditure £90.59k £140.99k £120.22k £150.64k £148.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A