Trustees STREET TALK

Charity number: 1117588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fatima Ba Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Aoife Ritchie Trustee 09 January 2022
None on record
Colleen Rhodes Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Charlotte Littlewood Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Keran Paige Trustee 02 January 2014
None on record
REBECCA HAMMOND Trustee
None on record