THE DRUID NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Informing, Inspiring and Facilitating Druidry as a Religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHIL RYDER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Mark Grundy | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aurora Joan Stone | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leonore Newson | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Pitchford | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FUNDERBURG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ROSHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.22k | £3.54k | £3.87k | £3.58k | £4.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £1.90k | £1.98k | £11.59k | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE INFORMATION ON THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF DRUIDRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL, AND TO INSPIRE AND FACILITATE THAT PRACTICE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE COMMITTED THEMSELVES TO THIS SPIRITUAL PATH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 RICHMOND TERRACE
DARWEN
BB3 0HE
- Phone:
- 07923964092
- Email:
- office@druidnetwork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window